WebMar 6, 2024 · The board of directors of General Dynamics (NYSE: GD) has elected Cecil D. Haney to be a director of the corporation, effective March 6. Haney, age 63, is a retired U.S. Navy admiral who previously served … Cecil Eugene Diggs Haney (born December 1, 1955) is a retired United States Navy admiral who served as Commander, United States Strategic Command (STRATCOM) from November 15, 2013 to November 3, 2016. Prior to STRATCOM, he served as Commander, United States Pacific Fleet. He received … See more Haney was born and raised in Washington, D.C., graduating from the United States Naval Academy in 1978, where he received a Bachelor of Science degree in Ocean Engineering. He holds master's degrees in … See more Haney serves on the Johns Hopkins University Applied Physics Laboratory Board of Managers. On March 6, 2024, General Dynamics elected Haney as a member of its board of directors. See more Haney completed operational assignments in USS John C. Calhoun in various division officer assignments and in USS Frank Cable, … See more
About: Cecil D. Haney - dbpedia.org
WebThe official website of CAPSTONE, National Defense University WebAug 1, 2024 · Cecil Haney biography. Cecil D. Haney is Independent Director of the Company. He is a Retired Admiral, U.S. Navy; Commander, U.S. Strategic Command, 2013 to 2016 ... naturopathe le haillan
Cecil D. Haney Net Worth, Age, Height, Weight, Wife, Wiki-Bio, …
WebView Cecil Haney’s profile on LinkedIn, the world’s largest professional community. Cecil has 2 jobs listed on their profile. See the complete profile on LinkedIn and discover Cecil’s ... WebSep 17, 2024 · Navy Admiral Cecil Haney was born into a struggling family in “humble surroundings” in Washington, D.C., on December 1, 1955. After graduating from the city’s Eastern High School he left for Annapolis, … WebSummary. Cecil D. Haney is Chairman at Military Child Education Coalition and Member-Managers Board at Johns Hopkins University Applied Physics Laboratory LLC and on the board of 6 other companies. He previously held the position of Member-Military Leadership Diversity Commission at US Department of Defense (District of Columbia). naturopathe le havre