Barbara j. desoer
WebJun 6, 2016 · Barbara J. Desoer, CEO of Citibank, N.A. (CBNA), is one of the five people being honored this year. The 16th annual Legal Momentum Aiming High Award honorees will be celebrated at a luncheon on June 7 in New York City. In addition to Desoer, this year’s award recipients are: WebOct 21, 2011 · Oct 21, 2011. Bank of America demoted longtime executive Barbara Desoer for a second time in six weeks Friday. Her career is widely followed in Bay Area financial circles because she’s the bank ...
Barbara j. desoer
Did you know?
WebBarbara J. Desoer Independent Non-Executive Director Phyllis R. Yale Independent Non-Executive Director Paul J. Diaz Independent Non-Executive Director expand Advertisement Average Growth Rates... WebBarbara J Desoer. Chief Executive Officer. Contact 2? Contact 3? Contact 4? See All Contacts. Dynamic search and list-building capabilities. Real-time trigger alerts. Comprehensive company profiles. Valuable research and technology reports. Get a D&B Hoovers Free Trial. Financial Data. Dun & Bradstreet collects private company …
WebBarbara J. Desoer. Former CEO, Citibank, N.A. Lynne Doughtie . Former Chair & CEO, KPMG Mark Fields. Former President & CEO, Ford Motor Company Mark Laret. Former CEO, UCSF Health Amy E. Miles. Former Chair & CEO, Regal Entertainment Group Clarence Otis. Former CEO, Darden Restaurants ... WebLifetime achievement: Barbara Desoer's unconventional path to big-bank CEO. By Joel Berg September 30, 2024, 9:30 p.m. EDT 8 Min Read. When she retired from banking …
WebJul 11, 2024 · desoer, barbara j charlotte, nc 28207: bank of america: $500: 05/21/2002: p: dole 2002 committee - republican: desoer, barbara j charlotte, nc 28207: bank of america: $500: 03/26/2002: p: erskine bowles for us senate - democrat: desoer, barbara j charlotte, nc 28207: bank of america: $1,000: 12/11/2001: p: friends of max baucus - democrat: WebBarbara Desoer is 70 years old and was born on 11/04/1952. Barbara Desoer lives in Thousand Oaks, CA; previous cities include New York NY and Alameda CA. In the past, …
WebNov 16, 2024 · Barbara Desoer Net Worth. The estimated Net Worth of Barbara J Desoer is at least $1.37 million dollars as of 31 May 2024. Ms. Desoer owns over 7,178 units of DaVita Inc stock worth over $597,784 and over the last 7 years she sold DVA stock worth over $380,082. In addition, she makes $387,765 as Independent Director at DaVita Inc.
WebDaVita's Chief Executive Officer, Director is Javier J Rodriguez. DaVita's key executives include Javier J Rodriguez and 35 others. Javier J Rodriguez Chief Executive Officer, Director Barbara J Desoer Director Charles G Berg Former Chief Executive Officer, Citibank, N.A. George R Aronoff Vice President of Clinical Affairs, Kidney Care mj flight schoolWebBarbara Desoer has been associated with one company, according to public records. The company was incorporated in Florida, Texas, Texas, California, and California twenty-two … mjf lightingWebNov 18, 2024 · Founder Barbara J. Desoer Former Chief Executive Officer Diana L. Taylor Board Member Grace E. Dailey Former Senior Deputy Comptroller For Bank Supervision Policy and Chief National Bank Examiner James S. Turley Board Member John C. Dugan Chair Citi Founders Name & TitleBio Duncan Pratt Hennes Board Member Renée Jo … mjf leavingWebBarbara J. Desoer. Currently, Barbara J. Desoer holds the position of Director at Citibank NA (New York). Ms. Desoer is also on the board of DaVita, Inc., Citigroup, Inc., Mount … mjf leaving aew for wweWebAs a member of Board of Directors at CITIGROUP INC, Barbara J. Desoer made $442,500 in total compensation. Of this total $292,500 was received as fees earned or paid in … m j flt hrtg 85 ls crewWebNot the Barbara Desoer you were looking for? Find contact details for 700 million professionals. Search. People Like Barbara Desoer . Pradeep Reddy Sr. Android Engineer. Plano, Texas, United States View. Jenny Werronen Corporate Controller. Seattle, Washington, United States View. ingwe granite solutionsWebMar 9, 2024 · Barbara J. Desoer has been one of our directors since October 2015. Ms. Desoer served as the chief executive officer and a member of the board of directors of … mjf long island